+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 3, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
- Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee
- Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
On December 8, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor