+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall -- Discussed
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (5)
264931 - Amendment to Amendment (215921)
Remove line 10 of the amendment and insert:
215921 - Amendment
Remove lines 48-55 and insert:
967999 - Amendment
Remove lines 50-59 and insert:
796253 - Substitute Amendment (967999)
Remove lines 43-59
981711 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor