+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Commerce and Tourism
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Banking and Insurance; Rules
- In Messages
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 27 NAYS 0
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/08/18, 10:00 am, Webster Hall
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Commerce Committee
- Favorable by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS by Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
On December 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
770269 - Substitute Amendment (751967)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
751967 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
607925 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
March 1, 2018: Floor vote: H 851 c2
- Yeas: 110
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor