+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Education Pre-K - 12
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
- In Messages
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 2
- Read 3rd time
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/16
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/09/16, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Now in Education Committee
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/02/16, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Now in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by K-12 Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- K-12 Subcommittee, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 1003.455 - Physical education; assessment.
+ − Vote
February 18, 2016: Floor vote: H 833
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor