+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 158 (Ch. 2016-4)
- Substituted CS/SB 158
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/02/16
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 01/28/16, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Now in Economic Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/19/16, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- CS by Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On October 28, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee
On October 21, 2015 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On October 13, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee, 10/20/15, 1:00 pm, 116 Knott Building
On September 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee
On August 20, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
450787 - Amendment
Remove lines 73-113 and insert:
649629 - Amendment
Remove lines 73-113 and insert:
927999 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor