+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7055 (Ch. 2018-6)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 25, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- PCS on Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, Reed Hall
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Original reference(s) removed: PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
- CS referred to Education Committee
- Now in Education Committee
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- CS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- CS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
On December 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
On November 28, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
988587 - Amendment
Remove line 202 and insert:
779679 - Amendment
Remove line 255 and insert:
368305 - Amendment
Remove line 331 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 1006.283 - District school board instructional materials review process.
- 1006.30 - Affidavit of state instructional materials reviewers.
- 1006.31 - Duties of the Department of Education and school district instructional materials reviewer.
- 1006.34 - Powers and duties of the commissioner and the department in selecting and adopting instructional materials.
- 1006.40 - Use of instructional materials allocation; instructional materials, library books, and reference books; repair of books.
- 1007.271 - Dual enrollment programs.
- 1008.22 - Student assessment program for public schools.
- 1012.98 - School Community Professional Development Act.