+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 396 (Ch. 2015-47)
- Substituted CS/CS/SB 396
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Now in State Affairs Committee
- CS referred to State Affairs Committee
- Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
273373 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor