+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Judiciary Committee
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 3
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/18/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 3
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/21/19, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee
On December 6, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
565603 - Amendment
Remove line 102 and insert:
141979 - Amendment
Remove lines 186-188 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 381.0041 - Donation and transfer of human tissue; testing requirements.
- 384.23 - Definitions.
- 384.24 - Unlawful acts.
- 384.34 - Penalties.
- 775.0877 - Criminal transmission of HIV; procedures; penalties.
- 921.0022 - Criminal Punishment Code; offense severity ranking chart.
- 960.003 - Hepatitis and HIV testing for persons charged with or alleged by petition for delinquency to have committed certain offenses; disclosure of results to victims.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor