+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2015-102
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/SB 340
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
- In Messages
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/12/15, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/03/15, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 02/17/15, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
On December 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
On December 9, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
532689 - Amendment
Remove lines 97-99 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 394.9082 - Behavioral health managing entities.
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2015: Floor vote: H 0079 c1
- Yeas: 39
April 16, 2015: Floor vote: H 0079 c1
- Yeas: 114