+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 186 (Ch. 2013-164)
- Substituted CS/SB 186
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/28/13, 10:30 am, 404 HOB
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Now in Judiciary Committee
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/13/13, 12:00 pm, 404 HOB
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 48.193 - Acts subjecting person to jurisdiction of courts of state.
- 55.502 - Construction of act.
- 684.0002 - Scope of application.
- 684.0003 - Definitions and rules of interpretation.
- 684.0019 - Conditions for granting interim measures.
- 684.0026 - Recognition and enforcement.
- 684.0049 - Consent to jurisdiction.
- 684.0049 -
- 685.101 - Choice of law.
- 685.102 - Jurisdiction.
+ − Sponsors (3)
Civil Justice Subcommittee
Type:
Primary Sponsor