+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2014-128, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 775 (Ch. 2014-129)
- Approved by Governor
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/SB 810
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Appropriations
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Appropriations
- In Messages
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (084203)
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/10/14, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
- Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/31/14, 11:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- PCS on Committee agenda-- Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee, 03/11/14, 12:30 pm, 12 HOB
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
084203 - Amendment
Between lines 513 and 514, insert:
211295 - Amendment
Remove lines 402-421 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
- 548.002 - Definitions.
- 548.004 - Executive director; duties, compensation, administrative support.
- 548.006 - Power of commission to control professional and amateur pugilistic contests and exhibitions; certification of competitiveness of professional mixed martial arts and kickboxing matches.
- 548.007 - Applicability of provisions to amateur matches and certain other matches or events.
- 548.015 - Concessionaires; security.
- 548.017 - Participants, managers, and other persons required to have licenses.
- 548.046 - Physician’s attendance at match; examinations; cancellation of match.
- 548.054 - Withholding of purses; hearing; disposition of withheld purse forfeiture.
- 548.06 - Payments to state; exemptions.
- 548.07 - Suspension of license or permit by commissioner; hearing.
- 548.073 - Commission hearings.
- 548.013 - Foreign copromoter license requirement.
- 548.014 - Promoters and foreign copromoters; bonds or other security.
- 548.052 - Payment of advances by promoter or foreign copromoter regulated.
- 548.066 - Ticket refunds.
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2014: Floor vote: H 0773 e1
- Yeas: 37
April 24, 2014: Floor vote: H 0773 e1
- Yeas: 118