+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2017-200
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Rules
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Local Calendar, 05/04/17
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Rules
- In Messages
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 75 NAYS 41
- Read 3rd time
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 8
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/13/17, 10:00 am, Morris Hall
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/06/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall --Discussed
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Government Accountability Committee
- Favorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 5
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 03/15/17, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
- Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 4
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/08/17, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendment
510887 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2017: Floor vote: H 759 c1
- Yeas: 38
April 28, 2017: Floor vote: H 759 c1
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 41
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor