+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2014-35
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 26 NAYS 7
- Concurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (517221)
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (517221)
- Amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) failed (571527)
- Concurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended (202426)
- Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (535776)
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 79 NAYS 37
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- In returning messages
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- In returning messages
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediately certified
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 25 NAYS 12
- Read 3rd time
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Withdrawn from Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
- Substituted for CS/SB 104
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Amendment(s) failed (421524)
- Amendment(s) adopted (535776)
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
- In Messages
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee
- Referred to- Calendar
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
- CS/CS by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/04/14, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Now in Judiciary Committee
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/05/14, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Appropriations Committee
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (11)
517221 - Amendment to Amendment (202426)
Remove lines 11-12 of the amendment and insert:
854765 - Substitute Amendment (571527)
Remove lines 5-16 and insert:
362351 - Amendment to Amendment (202426)
Remove lines 10-12 of the amendment and insert:
252519 - Substitute Amendment (571527)
Remove lines 5-16 and insert:
571527 - Amendment to Amendment (202426)
Remove lines 5-16 of the amendment
202426 - Amendment
Between lines 140 and 141 insert:
268402 - Amendment to Amendment (421524)
Delete lines 9 - 11 and insert:
421524 - Amendment
Between lines 140 and 141 insert:
535776 - Amendment
Delete line 193 and insert:
715837 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
740181 - Amendment
Remove lines 205-252 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 61.30 - Child support guidelines; retroactive child support.
- 90.204 - Determination of propriety of judicial notice and nature of matter noticed.
- 741.30 - Domestic violence; injunction; powers and duties of court and clerk; petition; notice and hearing; temporary injunction; issuance of injunction; statewide verification system; enforcement; public records exemption.
- 784.046 - Action by victim of repeat violence, sexual violence, or dating violence for protective injunction; dating violence investigations, notice to victims, and reporting; pretrial release violations; public records exemption.
- 784.0485 - Stalking; injunction; powers and duties of court and clerk; petition; notice and hearing; temporary injunction; issuance of injunction; statewide verification system; enforcement.
- 454.021 - Attorneys; admission to practice law; Supreme Court to govern and regulate.
+ − Votes (5)
May 2, 2014: Floor vote: H 0755 c2
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 7
May 1, 2014: Floor vote: H 0755 c2
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 37
April 25, 2014: Floor vote: H 0755 c2
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 12
April 24, 2014: Floor vote: H 0755 c2 - Amendment 421524
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 19
April 23, 2014: Floor vote: H 0755 c2
- Yeas: 117