+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 526 (Ch. 2014-4)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/20/14, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/14, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/16/14, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On October 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On September 24, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
468089 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor