+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Regulated Industries
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Rules
- In Messages
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Passed as amended; YEAS 74 NAYS 42
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (613409)
- Read 2nd time
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 5
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/28/13, 10:30 am, 404 HOB
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 2
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/18/13, 2:00 pm, 404 HOB
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
613409 - Substitute Amendment (908973)
04/16/2013 at 3:36 PM
908973 - Amendment
04/16/2013 at 12:58 PM
+ − Statute Amended
- 83.806 - Enforcement of lien.
+ − Votes (4)
April 17, 2013: House floor vote on H 0727
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 42
April 17, 2013: House floor vote on H 0727 - Amendment 613409
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 43
April 17, 2013: Floor Vote: House - Amendment 613409
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 43
April 17, 2013: Floor Vote: House
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 42
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor