+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Immediately certified
- CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022)
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Reported out of Commerce Committee
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- CS Filed
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Commerce Committee agenda
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Commerce Committee
- Referred to Commerce Committee
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
On December 13, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
- Referred to Commerce Committee
- Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
On November 23, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
010799 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 1/13/2022)
Remove lines 106-111 and insert:
787925 - Strike All Amendment (Adopted 1/24/2022)
Remove lines 50-109 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Vote
February 10, 2022: Floor vote: H 723 c2
- Yeas: 118