+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/16/19, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 12 HOB
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
- Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/20/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
424061 - Amendment
Remove line 77 and insert:
794237 - Amendment
Remove line 82 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 413.08 - Rights and responsibilities of an individual with a disability; use of a service animal; prohibited discrimination in public employment, public accommodations, and housing accommodations; penalties.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor