+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 342 (Ch. 2015-17)
- Substituted CS/CS/CS/SB 342
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/19/15, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/12/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
521055 - Amendment
Remove line 37 and insert:
731563 - Amendment
Remove line 26 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 741.29 - Domestic violence; investigation of incidents; notice to victims of legal rights and remedies; reporting.
- 784.046 - Action by victim of repeat violence, sexual violence, or dating violence for protective injunction; dating violence investigations, notice to victims, and reporting; pretrial release violations; public records exemption.
- 901.15 - When arrest by officer without warrant is lawful.
- 903.047 - Conditions of pretrial release.