+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/16/13, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 390.012 - Powers of agency; rules; disposal of fetal remains.
- 400.021 - Definitions.
- 400.0712 - Application for inactive license.
- 400.176 - Rebates prohibited; penalties.
- 400.23 - Rules; evaluation and deficiencies; licensure status.
- 400.487 - Home health service agreements; physician’s, physician assistant’s, and advanced registered nurse practitioner’s treatment orders; patient assessment; establishment and review of plan of care; provision of services; orders not to resuscitate.
- 400.497 - Rules establishing minimum standards.
- 400.506 - Licensure of nurse registries; requirements; penalties.
- 400.509 - Registration of particular service providers exempt from licensure; certificate of registration; regulation of registrants.
- 400.914 - Rules establishing standards.
- 483.245 - Rebates prohibited; penalties.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee
Type:
Primary Sponsor