+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
- In Messages
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 88 NAYS 24
- Read 3rd time
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (313297, 893961)
- Read 2nd time
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15
- Placed on Calendar
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 1
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/07/15, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
- Filed
+ − Amendments (9)
313297 - Amendment
Remove line 232 and insert:
893961 - Amendment
Remove line 588 and insert:
162397 - Substitute Amendment (127029)
Remove lines 179-180 and insert:
243371 - Amendment
Between lines 108 and 109, insert:
127029 - Amendment
Remove lines 179-180 and insert:
757079 - Amendment
Remove lines 382-410 and insert:
501125 - Amendment
Remove lines 523-529 and insert:
854537 - Amendment
Remove line 499 and insert:
969191 - Amendment
Between lines 560 and 561, insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
+ − Vote
April 16, 2015: Floor vote: H 7135 e1
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 24
+ − Sponsors (2)
Appropriations Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor