+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38), CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
- Substituted CS/SB 4
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/13
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/16/13, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/09/13, 2:30 pm, Morris Hall --Temporarily deferred
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
130925 - Strike All Amendment
04/23/2013 at 1:08 PM
394577 - Strike All Amendment
04/08/2013 at 5:15 PM
+ − Statute Amended
- 112.324 - Procedures on complaints of violations and referrals; public records and meeting exemptions.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Ethics and Elections Subcommittee
Type:
Primary Sponsor