+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Retained on Calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/13
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/09/13, 2:30 pm, Reed Hall
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic Affairs Committee
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
459799 - Amendment
04/29/2013 at 10:48 PM
205131 - Amendment
04/17/2013 at 12:01 PM
184527 - Amendment
04/08/2013 at 6:13 PM
060677 - Amendment
04/08/2013 at 6:12 PM
+ − Sponsors (3)
Economic Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor