+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2017-35, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 7105 (Passed)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- Passed as amended; YEAS 90 NAYS 24
- Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (690150)
- In returning messages
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed as amended; YEAS 28 NAYS 9
- Read 3rd time
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by- Rules (690150); YEAS 8 NAYS 1
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/17
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (690150)
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/28/17, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
- Referred to Rules
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 84 NAYS 30
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Calendar
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendment
690150 - Amendment
Delete lines 22 - 23 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: H 7107 Filed
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
May 2, 2017: Floor vote: H 7107
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 24
May 1, 2017: Floor vote: H 7107
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 9
April 26, 2017: Floor vote: H 7107
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 30
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor