+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7034 (Ch. 2015-78)
- Substituted CS/SB 7034
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/26/15, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Government Operations Subcommittee
Type:
Primary Sponsor