+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 20, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2014-167
- Approved by Governor
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- In returning messages
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 3
- Amendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (727844)
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Was taken up
- Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (727844)
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 89 NAYS 27
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (829928)
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1216
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 93 NAYS 16
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received
- In Messages
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (326865, 552287)
- Read 2nd time
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/14
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 2
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/01/14, 2:30 pm, Webster Hall
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced
- Filed
+ − Amendments (16)
829928 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
727844 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
138212 - Amendment to Amendment (829928)
Delete lines 537 - 550 and insert:
489748 - Amendment to Amendment (600380)
Delete line 269 and insert:
884406 - Amendment to Amendment (600380)
Delete lines 299 - 300 and insert:
278586 - Amendment to Amendment (600380)
Delete lines 299 - 300 and insert:
955902 - Amendment to Amendment (600380)
Delete line 457 and insert:
610294 - Amendment to Amendment (600380)
Delete line 128 and insert:
813994 - Amendment to Amendment (600380)
Delete lines 494 - 497 and insert:
155200 - Amendment to Amendment (856490)
Delete line 215 and insert:
600380 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
856490 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
552287 - Amendment
Remove line 263 and insert:
326865 - Amendment
Between lines 583 and 584, insert:
957421 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
534071 - Amendment to Amendment (957421)
Remove line 212 of the amendment and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 212.20 - Funds collected, disposition; additional powers of department; operational expense; refund of taxes adjudicated unconstitutionally collected.
- 218.64 - Local government half-cent sales tax; uses; limitations.
- 288.0001 - Economic Development Programs Evaluation.
- 288.11625 -
- 288.1166 - Professional sports facility; designation as shelter site for the homeless; establishment of local programs.
- 288.11631 - Retention of Major League Baseball spring training baseball franchises.
+ − Votes (4)
May 2, 2014: Floor vote: H 7095 e1
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 27
May 2, 2014: Floor vote: H 7095 e1
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 3
April 25, 2014: Floor vote: H 7095 e1
- Yeas: 104
April 25, 2014: Floor vote: H 7095 e1
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 16
+ − Sponsors (4)
Appropriations Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor