+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
- In Messages
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/16
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/09/16, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
775567 - Amendment to Amendment (023773)
Remove line 127 of the amendment and insert:
023773 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 28.35 - Florida Clerks of Court Operations Corporation.
- 40.24 - Compensation and reimbursement policy.
- 40.29 - Payment of due-process costs.
- 40.31 - Justice Administrative Commission may apportion appropriation.
- 40.32 - Clerks to disburse money; payments to jurors and witnesses.
- 40.33 - Deficiency.
- 40.34 - Clerks to make triplicate payroll.
+ − Vote
March 3, 2016: Floor vote: H 7095 c1
- Yeas: 118
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor