+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died on Calendar
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (732884)
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/SB 774
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed; YEAS 99 NAYS 20
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
- Referred to Education Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
732884 - Amendment (Senate: Adopted 3/12/2020)
Delete lines 31 - 105 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 1004.098 -
+ − Vote
March 4, 2020: Floor vote: H 7081 Filed
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 20
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor