+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2017-151)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (771645)
- Read 2nd time
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
- CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/20/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/06/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall --Temporarily Postponed
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
- Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
771645 - Amendment
Between lines 305 and 306, insert:
046129 - Amendment
Between lines 362 and 363, insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 39.01 - Definitions.
- 39.013 - Procedures and jurisdiction; right to counsel.
- 39.6035 - Transition plan.
- 39.621 - Permanency determination by the court.
- 409.996 - Duties of the Department of Children and Families.
- 125.901 - Children’s services; independent special district; council; powers, duties, and functions; public records exemption.
- 39.507 - Adjudicatory hearings; orders of adjudication.
- 39.521 - Disposition hearings; powers of disposition.
- 39.701 - Judicial review.
- 39.806 - Grounds for termination of parental rights.
- 39.811 - Powers of disposition; order of disposition.
+ − Vote
April 28, 2017: Floor vote: H 7075 e1
- Yeas: 118