+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 19 (Ch. 2019-99)
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
- Referred to Rules
- In Messages
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 103 NAYS 11
- Read 3rd time
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 6
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/28/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 3
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/18/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
- Referred to Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
- Filed
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (3)
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: H 7073 Filed
- Yeas: 16
April 26, 2019: Floor vote: H 7073 Filed
- Yeas: 35
April 11, 2019: Floor vote: H 7073 Filed
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor