+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Chapter No. 2015-6
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- Immediately certified
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 105 NAYS 6
- Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (401220)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- In returning messages
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 32 NAYS 4
- Amendment(s) adopted (401220)
- Read 3rd time
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Retained on Special Order Calendar, 04/02/15
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/CS/SB 616
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (713409)
- Amendment(s) failed (894999, 942323)
- Read 2nd time
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/17/15
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
- CS by- Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/12/15, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
- Referred to Education Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
- Filed
+ − Amendments (20)
401220 - Amendment
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
772036 - Amendment to Amendment (211438)
Between lines 624 and 625 insert:
550812 - Amendment to Amendment (211438)
Delete line 133 and insert:
972844 - Amendment to Amendment (211438)
Delete lines 1152 - 1165.
606982 - Amendment to Amendment (211438)
Between lines 454 and 455 insert:
284376 - Amendment to Amendment (211438)
Between lines 624 and 625 insert:
658668 - Amendment to Amendment (211438)
Delete lines 1078 - 1086 and insert:
668820 - Amendment to Amendment (211438)
Delete lines 14 - 18 and insert:
211438 - Amendment
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
942323 - Amendment
Between lines 519 and 520, insert:
894999 - Amendment
Between lines 1177 and 1178, insert:
713409 - Amendment
Remove lines 1200-1312 and insert:
584547 - Amendment
Remove line 525 and insert:
304735 - Amendment
Remove lines 695-697 and insert:
945809 - Amendment
Between lines 1149 and 1150, insert:
424705 - Amendment
Between lines 1149 and 1150, insert:
108261 - Amendment
Between lines 219 and 220, insert:
254235 - Amendment
Remove lines 1264-1314 and insert:
657473 - Amendment
Remove lines 1376-1398 and insert:
642199 - Amendment
Remove lines 1671-1716 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
- 1001.42 - Powers and duties of district school board.
- 1002.20 - K-12 student and parent rights.
- 1003.4156 - General requirements for middle grades promotion.
- 1003.4282 - Requirements for a standard high school diploma.
- 1003.4285 - Standard high school diploma designations.
- 1003.621 - Academically high-performing school districts.
- 1008.22 - Student assessment program for public schools.
- 1008.24 - Test administration and security; public records exemption.
- 1008.25 - Public school student progression; remedial instruction; reporting requirements.
- 1008.30 - Common placement testing for public postsecondary education.
- 1011.62 - Funds for operation of schools.
- 1012.34 - Personnel evaluation procedures and criteria.
- 1012.3401 - Requirements for measuring student performance in instructional personnel and school administrator performance evaluations; performance evaluation of personnel for purposes of performance salary schedule.
- 1012.98 - School Community Professional Development Act.
- 1008.36 - Florida School Recognition Program.
- 1008.34 - School grading system; school report cards; district grade.
+ − Votes (6)
April 9, 2015: Floor vote: H 7069 e1
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 6
April 2, 2015: Floor vote: H 7069 e1 - Amendment 658668
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 22
April 2, 2015: Floor vote: H 7069 e1
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 4
March 18, 2015: Floor vote: H 7069 e1
- Yeas: 115
March 17, 2015: Floor vote: H 7069 c1 - Amendment 942323
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 75
March 17, 2015: Floor vote: H 7069 c1 - Amendment 894999
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 80
+ − Sponsors (6)
Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Type:
Primary Sponsor