+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 524 (Ch. 2022-73)
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Reported out of Appropriations Committee
- Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
094703 - Strike All Amendment (Withdrawn Prior to Consideration 2/25/2022)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
685903 - Strike All Amendment (Adopted 2/28/2022)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (24)
- 15.21 - Initiative petitions; s. 3, Art. XI, State Constitution.
- 16.061 - Initiative petitions.
- 97.022 -
- 97.0291 - Prohibition on use of private funds for election-related expenses.
- 97.057 - Voter registration by the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles.
- 97.0575 - Third-party voter registrations.
- 98.065 - Registration list maintenance programs.
- 98.0655 - Registration list maintenance forms.
- 98.075 - Registration records maintenance activities; ineligibility determinations.
- 98.093 - Duty of officials to furnish information relating to deceased persons, persons adjudicated mentally incapacitated, and persons convicted of a felony.
- 100.041 - Officers chosen at general election.
- 100.371 - Initiatives; procedure for placement on ballot.
- 101.019 -
- 101.043 - Identification required at polls.
- 101.5614 - Canvass of returns.
- 101.6103 - Mail ballot election procedure.
- 101.655 - Supervised voting by absent electors in certain facilities.
- 102.091 - Duty of sheriff to watch for violations; appointment of special officers.
- 102.101 - Sheriff and other officers not allowed in polling place.
- 104.0616 - Vote-by-mail ballots and voting; violations.
- 104.185 - Petitions; knowingly signing more than once; signing another person’s name or a fictitious name.
- 104.186 - Initiative petitions; violations.
- 124.011 - Alternate procedure for the election of county commissioners to provide for single-member representation.
- 921.0022 - Criminal Punishment Code; offense severity ranking chart.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor