+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
- In Messages
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
- Placed on Calendar
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
- CS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Government Accountability Committee
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/14/18, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations Committee; Government Accountability Committee
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
730039 - Amendment
Remove lines 47-70 and insert:
304273 - Amendment
Remove lines 47-70 and insert:
727891 - Amendment
Remove lines 19-22 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 215.9851 -
+ − Vote
March 1, 2018: Floor vote: H 7057 c2
- Yeas: 114
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor