+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died in Education Pre-K - 12
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
- In Messages
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 102 NAYS 8
- Read 3rd time
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/15
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
- Placed on Calendar
- CS by Education Committee read 1st time
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/19/15, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Education Committee
- Favorable by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/12/15, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
- Referred to Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
- Filed
+ − Amendment
726509 - Amendment
Remove lines 106-126 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
March 27, 2015: Floor vote: H 7043 c1
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsors (9)
Education Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor