+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On July 1, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2013-225, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1514 (Ch. 2013-45)
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 90 NAYS 25
- Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (675332)
- Was taken up
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 27 NAYS 12
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- In returning messages
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (317092)
- Amendment(s) adopted (317092)
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/CS/SB 904
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 82 NAYS 37
- Amendment(s) failed (347035, 751133)
- Read 3rd time
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) failed (603625)
- Read 2nd time
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/02/13
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 7
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
- CS by Education Committee read 1st time
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/27/13, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Education Committee
- Favorable by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 5
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/19/13, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (20)
555295 - Amendment to Amendment (675332)
05/03/2013 at 8:31 AM
692653 - Amendment to Amendment (675332)
05/02/2013 at 2:53 PM
675332 - Amendment (Delete All)
05/02/2013 at 2:24 PM
556616 - Amendment to Amendment (317092)
05/01/2013 at 3:08 PM
331014 - Amendment to Amendment (317092)
05/01/2013 at 2:24 PM
278236 - Amendment to Amendment (317092)
05/01/2013 at 10:33 AM
674782 - Amendment to Amendment (317092)
05/01/2013 at 10:33 AM
518166 - Amendment to Amendment (317092)
05/01/2013 at 10:32 AM
317092 - Amendment (Delete All)
04/30/2013 at 7:34 PM
566240 - Amendment (Delete All)
04/30/2013 at 4:53 PM
427440 - Amendment
04/25/2013 at 10:41 AM
298376 - Amendment
04/25/2013 at 10:38 AM
359212 - Amendment
04/24/2013 at 11:54 AM
199092 - Amendment
04/24/2013 at 11:53 AM
347035 - Amendment
04/03/2013 at 7:10 PM
751133 - Amendment
04/03/2013 at 6:59 PM
117727 - Amendment
04/01/2013 at 2:50 PM
603625 - Amendment
04/01/2013 at 1:55 PM
319705 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
166885 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (17)
- 1002.321 - Digital learning.
- 1002.37 - The Florida Virtual School.
- 1003.01 - Definitions.
- 1003.498 - School district virtual course offerings.
- 1003.499 - Florida Approved Courses and Tests (FACT) Initiative.
- 1004.0961 - Credit for online courses.
- 1008.24 - Test administration and security.
- 1003.499 -
- 1004.0961 -
- 1008.24 - Test security.
- 1001.42 - Powers and duties of district school board.
- 1002.45 - Virtual instruction programs.
- 1002.451 -
- 1007.01 - Articulation; legislative intent; purpose; role of the State Board of Education and the Board of Governors; Articulation Coordinating Committee.
- 1007.24 - Statewide course numbering system.
- 1011.61 - Definitions.
- 1011.622 -
+ − Votes (7)
May 3, 2013: Floor Vote: House
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 25
May 3, 2013: House floor vote on H 7029 c1
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 25
May 2, 2013: Floor Vote: Senate
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 12
May 2, 2013: Senate floor vote on H 7029 c1
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 12
April 4, 2013: Floor Vote: House
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 37
April 2, 2013: Floor Vote: House - Amendment 603625
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 74
April 2, 2013: House floor vote on H 7029 c1 - Amendment 603625
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 74