+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2020-92
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for SB 7002
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/06/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Now in State Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 383.412 - Public records and public meetings exemptions.
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2020: Floor vote: H 7023 Filed
- Yeas: 37
February 26, 2020: Floor vote: H 7023 Filed
- Yeas: 114
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor