+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
- In Messages
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 107 NAYS 2
- Read 3rd time
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (113851, 166449, 166695, 312071, 482881, 672201)
- Read 2nd time
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time --nullified
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 01/27/16, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On December 3, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Education Committee
On December 2, 2015 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On November 24, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/01/15, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
On November 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
On November 20, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (17)
672201 - Amendment
Remove lines 107-148 and insert:
637133 - Amendment
Between lines 330 and 331, insert:
113851 - Amendment
Between lines 330 and 331, insert:
406217 - Amendment
Between lines 330 and 331, insert:
312071 - Amendment
Remove lines 341-422 and insert:
482881 - Amendment
Remove lines 441-528 and insert:
166695 - Amendment
Remove lines 785-1038 and insert:
166449 - Amendment
Remove lines 779-780 and insert:
938723 - Amendment
Remove lines 105-158 and insert:
541957 - Amendment
Between lines 311 and 312, insert:
073521 - Amendment
Remove lines 523-553 and insert:
886847 - Amendment
Remove lines 777-791 and insert:
686005 - Amendment
Remove lines 674-676 and insert:
790579 - Amendment
Remove lines 797-836 and insert:
648821 - Amendment
Remove lines 890-893 and insert:
892159 - Amendment
Remove lines 924-1045 and insert:
073881 - Amendment
Between lines 1044 and 1045, insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
- 1001.215 - Just Read, Florida! Office.
- 1001.42 - Powers and duties of district school board.
- 1002.20 - K-12 student and parent rights.
- 1002.59 - Emergent literacy and performance standards training courses.
- 1002.67 - Performance standards; curricula and accountability.
- 1002.69 - Statewide kindergarten screening; kindergarten readiness rates; state-approved prekindergarten enrollment screening; good cause exemption.
- 1004.04 - Public accountability and state approval for teacher preparation programs.
- 1004.85 - Postsecondary educator preparation institutes.
- 1008.25 - Public school student progression; student support; reporting requirements.
- 1008.345 - Implementation of state system of school improvement and education accountability.
- 1011.67 - Funds for instructional materials.
- 1012.567 -
- 1012.585 - Process for renewal of professional certificates.
- 1012.586 - Additions or changes to certificates; duplicate certificates.
- 1012.98 - School Community Professional Development Act.
- 1003.432 -
+ − Vote
March 7, 2016: Floor vote: H 7021 e1
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor