+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2013-213, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 269 (Ch. 2013-193), CS/CS/CS/HB 375 (Ch. 2013-79), CS/CS/HB 537 (Ch. 2013-115)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
- Concurred in 2 amendment(s) (509504, 703592)
- In returning messages
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (509504, 703592)
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1840
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Rules
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Rules
- In Messages
- Received
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (422647, 485475, 524195, 723029)
- Read 2nd time
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/13
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/09/13, 2:30 pm, Reed Hall
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic Affairs Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (11)
Amendment 1
Remove line 77 of the amendment and insert:
509504 - Substitute Amendment (403068)
04/30/2013 at 3:43 PM
703592 - Amendment
04/30/2013 at 9:53 AM
403068 - Amendment
04/30/2013 at 8:37 AM
873536 - Amendment
04/29/2013 at 4:31 PM
524195 - Amendment
04/22/2013 at 1:33 PM
422647 - Amendment
04/22/2013 at 1:14 PM
723029 - Amendment
04/22/2013 at 12:47 PM
485475 - Amendment
04/19/2013 at 1:29 PM
746327 - Amendment to Amendment (363495)
04/09/2013 at 11:17 AM
363495 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 125.022 - Development permits.
- 125.35 - County authorized to sell real and personal property and to lease real property.
- 163.3167 - Scope of act.
- 166.033 - Development permits.
- 341.8203 - Definitions.
- 341.822 - Powers and duties.
- 341.825 - Communication facilities.
- 341.840 - Tax exemption.
- 381.0065 - Onsite sewage treatment and disposal systems; regulation.
- 341.825 -
+ − Votes (5)
May 2, 2013: House floor vote on H 7019 e1
- Yeas: 118
May 2, 2013: Floor Vote: House
- Yeas: 118
May 2, 2013: Senate floor vote on H 7019 e1
- Yeas: 38
May 2, 2013: Floor Vote: Senate
- Yeas: 38
April 24, 2013: Floor Vote: House
- Yeas: 115
+ − Sponsors (3)
Economic Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor