+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2016-3, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1083 (Ch. 2016-140), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65)
- Approved by Governor
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
- Ordered enrolled
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Immediately certified
- CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/SB 7010
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Immediately certified
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy
- Received
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- CS by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/14/16
- Introduced
On November 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On November 18, 2015 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- CS by- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/17/15, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
On November 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
On October 26, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
149871 - Amendment
Remove lines 695-717 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (3)
January 15, 2016: Floor vote: H 7003 c1
- Yeas: 35
January 15, 2016: Floor vote: H 7003 c1
- Yeas: 35
January 14, 2016: Floor vote: H 7003 c1
- Yeas: 110