+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall -- Workshopped
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On November 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Government Accountability Committee
On November 14, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 112.1816 -
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor