+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On December 13, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
- Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
- Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
On November 22, 2021 in the House:
- Filed