+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2013-201
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Substituted for CS/SB 644
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
- In Messages
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 03/27/13, 2:00 pm, 404 HOB
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/20/13, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/06/13, 1:00 pm, 404 HOB
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
432061 - Amendment
Remove lines 211-215 and insert:
590101 - Amendment
Remove lines 215-216 and insert:
873647 - Amendment
Between lines 210 and 211, insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (4)
April 30, 2013: Senate floor vote on H 0665 c2
- Yeas: 39
April 30, 2013: Floor Vote: Senate
- Yeas: 39
April 17, 2013: House floor vote on H 0665 c2
- Yeas: 118
April 17, 2013: Floor Vote: House
- Yeas: 118
+ − Sponsors (4)
Regulatory Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor