+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (41)
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188), HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161), CS/SB 1520 (Ch. 2017-122)
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 1
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/CS/SB 744
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Rules
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment(s) adopted (576965)
- Read 3rd time
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 119 NAYS 0
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Messages
- Referred to Rules
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (759395)
- Read 2nd time
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
- Placed on Calendar
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/17
- CS/CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- CS/CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 3
On April 22, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/24/17, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Commerce Committee
- Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/17/17, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
- CS referred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS/CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- CS/CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 4
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
- Now in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee read 1st time
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 5
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (8)
576965 - Amendment
Remove lines 91-408 and insert:
759395 - Substitute Amendment (260251)
Remove line 1305 and insert:
961515 - Amendment
Remove line 1305 and insert:
260251 - Amendment
Remove line 1305 and insert:
164967 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
145541 - Amendment to Amendment (164967)
Remove line 95 of the amendment and insert:
745115 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
704357 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- 718.111 - The association.
- 718.112 - Bylaws.
- 718.707 - Time limitation for classification as bulk assignee or bulk buyer.
- 719.104 - Cooperatives; access to units; records; financial reports; assessments; purchase of leases.
- 719.1055 - Amendment of cooperative documents; alteration and acquisition of property.
- 719.106 - Bylaws; cooperative ownership.
- 720.303 - Association powers and duties; meetings of board; official records; budgets; financial reporting; association funds; recalls.
- 720.306 - Meetings of members; voting and election procedures; amendments.
- 720.3085 - Payment for assessments; lien claims.
- 718.113 - Maintenance; limitation upon improvement; display of flag; hurricane shutters and protection; display of religious decorations.
- 719.107 - Common expenses; assessment.
- 633.2225 -
- 718.117 - Termination of condominium.
- 720.401 - Prospective purchasers subject to association membership requirement; disclosure required; covenants; assessments; contract cancellation.
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2017: Floor vote: H 653 e2
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
May 2, 2017: Floor vote: H 653 e1
- Yeas: 119
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor