+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/06/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Now in Judiciary Committee
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
624717 - Amendment (Adopted 1/29/2020)
Remove lines 117-119 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor