+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2018-57
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for SB 950
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 100 NAYS 13
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 01/18/18, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Government Accountability Committee
- Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
On November 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
On November 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2018: Floor vote: H 651
- Yeas: 36
January 31, 2018: Floor vote: H 651
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor