+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2017-57
- Approved by Governor
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1
- Read 3rd time
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/SB 28
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Appropriations
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Appropriations
- In Messages
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 2
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/13/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/04/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
301485 - Amendment
Remove lines 89-92 and insert:
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2017: Floor vote: H 6501 c1
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
April 26, 2017: Floor vote: H 6501 c1
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor