+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 140 (Ch. 2020-11)
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- CS/CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- CS/CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 5
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
- CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time
- CS/CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
On December 12, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Commerce Committee
On December 11, 2019 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS/CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 1
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
On November 12, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
On November 7, 2019 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On November 6, 2019 in the House:
- CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 5
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 11/06/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
On September 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
On August 15, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
209503 - Strike All Amendment (Adopted without Objection 11/6/2019)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
610177 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 12/11/2019)
Remove line 32 and insert:
535995 - Strike All Amendment (Adopted without Objection 2/27/2020)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
758261 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 791.08 -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Rodriguez, A.M.
Type:
Primary Sponsor