+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 872 (Ch. 2018-85)
- Substituted CS/SB 872
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/13/18, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
- Now in Commerce Committee
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/06/18, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On November 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
On November 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendment
373891 - Amendment
Remove lines 30-63
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor