+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 556 (Ch. 2013-109)
- Substituted CS/CS/CS/SB 556
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/13
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/13
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/16/13, 2:00 pm, 404 HOB
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/04/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/13/13, 12:00 pm, 404 HOB
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/06/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB --Temporarily deferred
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (6)
689451 - Amendment
Between lines 527 and 528, insert:
455555 - Amendment
Remove line 498 and insert:
566395 - Amendment
Remove lines 296-344
415453 - Amendment
Remove lines 541-855
536163 - Amendment
Remove lines 426-427 and insert:
347909 - Amendment
Remove lines 311-332 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (18)
- 28.13 - Papers and electronic filings.
- 28.222 - Clerk to be county recorder.
- 28.24 - Service charges.
- 28.244 - Refunds.
- 28.345 - State access to records; exemption from court
- 101.151 - Specifications for ballots.
- 119.0714 - Court files; court records; official records.
- 194.032 - Hearing purposes; timetable.
- 938.30 - Financial obligations in criminal cases; supplementary proceedings.
- 985.045 - Court records.
- 28.13 - To keep papers.
- 28.24 - Service charges by clerk of the circuit court.
- 28.345 - Exemption from court-related fees and charges.
- 57.081 - Costs; right to proceed where prepayment of costs and payment of filing fees waived.
- 57.082 - Determination of civil indigent status.
- 197.502 - Application for obtaining tax deed by holder of tax sale certificate; fees.
- 197.542 - Sale at public auction.
- 197.582 - Disbursement of proceeds of sale.
+ − Sponsors (3)
Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Type:
Primary Sponsor