+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/09/13, 10:30 am, Reed Hall
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Education Committee
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 04/01/13, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee, 03/19/13, 2:00 pm, Reed Hall
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Education Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
367941 - Amendment
Remove lines 32-75 and insert:
413547 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 1004.097 -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Government Operations Subcommittee
Type:
Primary Sponsor