+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations; Rules
- In Messages
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
- Placed on Calendar
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/30/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
- Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Health Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 03/07/17, 4:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
854455 - Amendment
Between lines 69 and 70, insert:
381171 - Amendment
Between lines 69 and 70, insert:
426847 - Amendment
Remove line 35 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Vote
April 20, 2017: Floor vote: H 619 c1
- Yeas: 118
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor